Financial history THE COLLINS PRIEST EDUCATION FUND

Charity number: 1110804
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.31k £9.42k £10.62k £12.79k £16.21k
Total expenditure £13.82k £10.35k £9.55k £7.46k £6.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A