Financial history INTEGRITY ACTION

Charity number: 1120927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.35m £1.14m £738.24k £718.63k £648.15k
Total expenditure £1.32m £1.19m £819.70k £738.75k £762.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £231.40k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £764.75k £0 £0 £55.20k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £581.34k £1.13m £720.53k £649.74k £617.99k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.56k £3.53k £966 £6.78k £16.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £16.74k £6.90k £14.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.27m £1.13m £752.71k £506.10k £664.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds £43.42k £62.97k £66.99k £147.63k £97.68k
Expenditure - Governance £16.62k £22.70k £24.40k £54.85k £14.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £365.47k £379.36k £113.38k £46.48k £26.33k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £85.02k £0