PAYPAL GIVING FUND UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PayPal Giving Fund UK harnesses the power of technology to make giving a part of everyday life, benefiting charities across the UK. We pursue our vision by partnering with leading internet businesses, developing innovative programs that introduce charitable giving in relevant and engaging ways to new audiences. The funds we raise enable us to support a wide range of charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£55,507,197
Donations and legacies | £55.50m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £4.41k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£55,517,894
Raising funds | £172.98k | |
Charitable activities | £55.34m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £172.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £55.34m |
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 July 2005: Standard registration
- MISSIONFISH - UK (Previous name)
- POINTS OF LIGHT FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Seager | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Onyemem | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Bracken | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sukhraj Singh Dhadwar | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Paul Chaudoir | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amit Ghosh | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.07m | £53.09m | £46.19m | £45.79m | £55.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.13m | £52.84m | £46.09m | £46.03m | £55.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.07m | £53.09m | £46.19m | £45.79m | £55.50m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £829 | £753 | £621 | £4.41k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £25.98m | £52.69m | £45.91m | £45.86m | £55.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £147.93k | £149.10k | £178.78k | £173.62k | £172.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £16.89k | £13.73k | £16.97k | £17.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £25.98m | £0 | £0 | £43.36m | £52.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.58m | £5.75m | £3.56m | £2.95m | £4.91m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.20m | £5.11m | £2.82m | £2.46m | £4.42m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/2013 as amended on 12 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ALL PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o PayPal UK
5 Fleet Place
LONDON
EC4M 7RD
- Phone:
- 08005870461
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window