ALL SAINTS CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community choir
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 27 October 2005: Standard registration
- ASC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH ROSE KELLY | Chair |
|
||||||
LOUISE GALLAGHER | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Yeatman | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Phillips | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne Dawes | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Ann Probett | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Brennan | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter John Parsons | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Warren Hoskins | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Hilary Ann Peggy Norton | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT CULLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENELOPE ANN DALTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.34k | £4.13k | £14.86k | £33.28k | £25.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.90k | £1.89k | £12.50k | £31.63k | £25.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL IT'S ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS; AND FOR SUCH GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 PARK ROAD
LONDON
E15 3QP
- Phone:
- 02084703365
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window