THE GUILDFORD WATERSIDE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To operate and develop the centre in an efficient and effective manner so that the member groups and other users of the centre can operate from it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES FREDERICK ROSSITER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Norman Hambly OBE | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|||||
David Halliwell | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Vance | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jacqueline Sharp | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Granville Kitching | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.64k | £109.45k | £340.27k | £74.36k | £106.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.26k | £86.47k | £274.77k | £73.11k | £121.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 05 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
4.1 TO BENEFIT PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITHIN THE UK WITHOUT DISTINCTIONS OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY: 4.1.1 TAKING OVER THE OPERATION OF THE GUILDFORD WATERSIDE CENTRE AT RIVERSIDE, GUILDFORD, SURREY GUI 1LW ("CENTRE") INCLUDING THE ASSETS AND CONTRACTS WITH STAFF AND ALL THE BENEFITS AND OBLIGATIONS OF THE CENTRE; 4.1.2 OPERATING THE CENTRE TO PROVIDE WATER ORIENTATED AND OTHER SPORTING ACTIVITIES, AND FOR MEETINGS, STORAGE OF EQUIPMENT AND OTHER FORMS OF LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; 4.1.3 EDUCATING AND ASSISTING PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; 4.1.4 PROVIDING A RESOURCE AND THERAPY CENTRE FOR PEOPLE WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHERE A RANGE OF COST-EFFECTIVE THERAPIES AND COUNSELLING IS AVAILABLE TO ASSIST WITH THE MANAGEMENT OF THE CONDITION; 4.1.5 PROVIDING INFORMATION, EDUCATION, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL HELP TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS IN THE FORM OF TRADITIONAL AND NATURAL THERAPIES; 4.1.6 PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4.2 TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SERVICES WHICH BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Waterside Centre
Riverside
GUILDFORD
GU1 1LW
- Phone:
- 07816253211
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window