THE BUFFINI CHAO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1111022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For such charitable purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion think fit. The core aim of the Foundation however is to support children and young people through education and training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Platt Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
SUE JANE GUTIERREZ Trustee 27 November 2014
None on record
MARIA GRAZIA HINDMARSH Trustee
None on record
SIR DAMON MARCUS BUFFINI Trustee
THE ROYAL ANNIVERSARY TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL NATIONAL THEATRE
Received: On time
LADY BUFFINI Trustee
ENGLISH NATIONAL BALLET
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £439.79k £611.13k £208.83k £743.82k £944.85k
Total expenditure £439.79k £611.13k £774.04k £743.82k £944.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £2.37m N/A £500.00k £994.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £1.86m N/A £500.00k £583.14k
Income - Investment N/A £101.23k N/A £501.89k £533.51k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £241.93k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £611.13k N/A £654.89k £849.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.20k N/A £13.38k £14.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £567.31k N/A £641.51k £835.71k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £88.93k £94.93k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Own use assets N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Long-term investments N/A £10.08m N/A £11.84m £13.27m
Other assets N/A £771.42k N/A £634.30k £314.98k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £11.71k N/A £8.70k £11.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE BUFFINI CHAO FOUNDATION
PO BOX 1427
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 9FP
Phone:
07493 652270