THE COBRA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1111109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

COBRA FOUNDATION IS AN INDEPENDENT CHARITY PROVIDING HEALTH, EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTH ASIA, ESPECIALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAFE WATER. CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES INCLUDE GIVING HELP WITH DISASTER RELIEF IN THE REGION.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 25 December 2023

Total income: £13,586
Total expenditure: £14,104

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Afghanistan
  • Bangladesh
  • Bhutan
  • Burma
  • India
  • Nepal
  • Pakistan
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 August 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICK SHERVINGTON MBE Chair
WOMEN'S HEALTH CONCERN LIMITED
Received: On time
BRITISH MENOPAUSE SOCIETY
Received: On time
LORD BILIMORIA Trustee
BRITISH CARDIAC RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE WELLINGTON COLLEGE
Received: On time
POLICY EXCHANGE LIMITED
Received: On time
MAURICE OSTRO Trustee
OSTRO FAYRE SHARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WOMANITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/12/2019 25/12/2020 25/12/2021 25/12/2022 25/12/2023
Total gross income £67.36k £29.01k £25.00k £25.00k £13.59k
Total expenditure £70.74k £40.16k £21.37k £23.00k £14.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 25 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 December 2020 13 December 2021 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 December 2020 13 December 2021 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH COTTAGE
LOWER NORTH WRAXALL
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 7AD
Phone:
01225891705