RAYLEIGH ROCHFORD AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an umbrella organisation representing the interests of all voluntary and charitable groups in the area. We are the link between the voluntary and statutory sectors and monitor, support and advise on all aspects of community care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £52,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 27 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Arthur Williams | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Leslie Mennell | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|||||
John William Donald Bobin | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH ALAN BUXTON | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||
JUNE ROSEMARY LUMLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.75k | £83.13k | £156.48k | £129.27k | £105.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.62k | £71.22k | £129.50k | £95.08k | £111.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £58.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.28k | £67.00k | £58.50k | £58.00k | £52.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF ROCHFORD AND IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Area of benefit
ROCHFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Courtyard Parish Office
Rectory Garth
RAYLEIGH
Essex
SS6 8BB
- Phone:
- 01268772796
- Email:
- rravs@rravs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window