Financial history CONCORDIA VOICES

Charity number: 1112448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.92k £7.10k £10.50k £10.99k £11.58k
Total expenditure £6.45k £9.73k £11.88k £11.10k £13.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A