THE BRITISH DAM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BDS exists to advance the education of the public and the profession in technical subjects relating to planning, design, construction, maintenance, operation, safety, environmental and social issues relating to dams. BDS produces the Dams & Reservoirs journal, organises a number of meetings and conferences both nationally and internationally and also acts as the UK National Committee of ICOLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2006: Standard registration
- BDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Louise DAVIES | Chair | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Williams | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Crawford Taylor Munro | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachael Jayne Lavery | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Drummond Modley | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Tracey Peters | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerallt Richards | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Carter | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert King | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Paul Cavanagh | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pepper | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Coombs | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Foster | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Christopher James Lockett CEng MICE | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Coombs GMICE | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Darren John Shaw CEng MICE | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NEIL THOMPSON CEng MICE | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.85k | £54.81k | £33.59k | £45.64k | £210.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.33k | £73.92k | £31.92k | £36.21k | £186.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE BRITISH DAM SOCIETY EXISTS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TECHNICAL SUBJECTS RELATING TO PLANNING, DESIGN, CONSTRUCTION, CIVIL ENGINEERING WORKS AND MORE PARTICULARLY THE SOCIETY MAY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES: (I) STIMULATE INTEREST AND ENCOURAGE IMPROVEMENTS IN THE PLANNING, DESIGN, CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE, OPERATION AND SAFETY OF DAMS AND RESERVOIRS. (II) FORM THE UK SECTION OF THE INTERNATIONAL COMMISSION ON LARGE DAMS (ICOLD). (III) CO-OPERATE WITH ICOLD, FOR THE DISTRIBUTION AND INTERCHANGE OF INFORMATION CONCERNING DAMS AND MAINTENANCE OF THE REGISTER OF LARGE DAMS IN RESPECT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM. (IV) PARTICIPATE IN MEETINGS OF ANY NATURE HELD BY ICOLD AND GENERALLY PROMOTE THE DECLARED OBJECTS OF ICOLD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS
1 GREAT GEORGE STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3AA
- Phone:
- 02076652244
- Email:
- bds@ice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window