OPERA AUSTRALIA CAPITAL FUND UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable objects and in particular to promote the education of the public in the arts of opera, music and dance by making grants to or for the benefit of The Opera Australia Capital Fund or to Opera Australia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Bernard Soames | Chair | 03 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dame Rachel Mary de Souza DBE | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Philip John Bacon | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JOHN CECIL DAUTH AO LVO | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||
SIR DAVID GREEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
WILLIAM HENRY FRANKEL OBE FRSSA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.94k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £36.95k | £23.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.20k | £220.81k | £446 | £1.84k | £803 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING WORDS) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF OPERA, MUSIC AND DANCE BY MAKING GRANTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE OPERA AUSTRALIA CAPITAL FUND, A CHARITABLE TRUST ESTABLISHED IN AUSTRALIA AND HAVING AN ENDORSEMENT UNDER SUB-DIVISION 50-B OF THE AUSTRALIAN INCOME TAX ASSESSMENT ACT 1997 (CTH) ("ITA") AS AN INCOME TAX EXEMPT CHARITABLE ENTITY AND ENDORSEMENT AS A DEDUCTIBLE GIFT RECIPIENT UNDER SUB-DIVISION 30-BA OF THE ITA, OR TO OPERA AUSTRALIA, A NON-PROFIT AUSTRALIAN INCORPORATED COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE ALSO HAVING AN ENDORSEMENT UNDER SUB-DIVISION 50-B OF THE ITA AS AS INCOME TAX EXEMPT CHARITABLE ENTITY AND ENDORSEMENT AS A DEDUCTIBLE GIFT RECIPIENT UNDER SUB-DIVISION 30-BA OF THE ITA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
25A FROGNAL
LONDON
NW3 6AR
- Phone:
- 02074355657
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window