Financial history EMERGENCY NUTRITION NETWORK

Charity Number: 1115156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.29m £1.46m £1.18m £2.02m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.24m £1.32m £1.45m £1.70m £1.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.46m £1.18m £2.01m £1.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £118 £120 £150 £10.86k £14.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.32m £1.45m £1.70m £1.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.25k £7.30k £10.23k £7.51k £11.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0