RIVERTIME BOAT TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To build a boat for disabled and disadvantaged children and adults to operate between Windsor and Oxford along the River Thames. The boat is primarily based at Henley on Thames and operates from the River & Rowing Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 03 May 2006: Standard registration
- 23 April 2025: Funds received from 1208502 FLOATABILITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Andrew Fisher | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Diane Patricia Lesley Smyth | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Robert Barrett DL | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||
JONATHAN RICHARD BARNARD HOBBS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.26k | £68.45k | £60.23k | £114.45k | £66.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.31k | £71.98k | £63.54k | £67.82k | £85.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A SPECIALLY CONSTRUCTED BOAT OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE DISABLED. 3.2 TO WORK WITH OTHER CHARITIES INVOLVED WITH THE DISABLED WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVES SUCH AS KIDS OUT. 3.3 TO ORGANISE BOAT TRIPS ON THE MIDDLE THAMES FOR DISABLED CHILDREN AND ADULTS.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 7
Avior
10 Longworth Drive
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 8XA
- Phone:
- 01628780700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window