Financial history GREEN LANE NURSERY AND CHILD CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1113518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £335.74k £417.94k £461.94k £531.49k £572.82k
Total expenditure £342.57k £395.35k £418.06k £485.50k £565.35k
Income from government contracts £132.67k £166.31k £170.55k £163.82k £201.19k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £531.20k £571.71k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £286 £1.11k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £485.50k £565.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0