Financial history THE BUTTERFLY HOSPICE TRUST

Charity Number: 1113697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £681.35k £815.84k £1.04m £1.61m £1.14m
Total expenditure £585.40k £670.69k £829.78k £1.04m £1.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £155.80k £3.54k £25.00k £19.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £146.81k £332.64k £234.11k £867.23k £328.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £41.75k £77.68k
Income - Charitable activities £478.37k £461.49k £753.48k £687.96k £713.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k £772 £1.60k £4.07k £17.25k
Income - Other £55.16k £20.93k £50.39k £7.23k £7.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £195.95k £140.71k £646.11k £167.62k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £311.43k £328.68k £373.94k £531.92k £599.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds £273.96k £342.01k £455.84k £507.65k £558.33k
Expenditure - Governance £12.74k £8.42k £5.98k £9.25k £24.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0