EAST BERGHOLT VC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fundraising for East Bergholt C of E VC Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 April 2006: Standard registration
- EAST BERGHOLT PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorna Richards | Chair | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Pyall | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cutting | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damion Schumacher | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Salmon | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Showell | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Chandler | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vasandhara Thoroughgood | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma De Vita | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Irven | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Annie Adamson | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.87k | £3.20k | £4.99k | £15.00k | £11.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.86k | £9.72k | £4.77k | £14.89k | £6.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EAST BERGHOLT, SUFFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brocketts Hall
Stones Green Road
Tendring
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Essex
CO16 0DD
- Phone:
- 07948728961
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window