JIGSAW (BURY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jigsaw is a member led organisation that aims to promote Fun, Freedom & Independence for disabled people in the Bury Metropolitan area. We support people to form and maintain friendships and enjoy an active social life. The social & sport activities and befriending scheme we coordinate aim to prevent social isolation, improve self esteem and community integration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £31,250 from 31250 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 01 August 2006: Standard registration
- JIGSAW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Leslie Mann | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Stephen Thornton | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gwyn | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lunness | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Liam Collinge | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.33k | £121.98k | £127.29k | £138.54k | £120.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.98k | £117.25k | £78.27k | £125.21k | £138.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £28.66k | £28.83k | £29.00k | N/A | £31.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.61k | £10.66k | N/A | £42.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 6 JULY 2006 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO MEET THE SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND SPORTING NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE THEIR ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE COMMUNITY. 2 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY COMBATING NEGATIVE PERCEPTIONS OF DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LANCASHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jigsaw
Unit 28
Bury Business Centre
Kay Street
Bury
BL9 6BU
- Phone:
- 01612536853
- Email:
- jigsaw@bury.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window