Financial history ALBERT MEMORIAL COLLEGE

Charity Number: 1114383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.26m £14.40m £14.99m £16.52m £16.58m
Total expenditure £15.07m £14.83m £14.95m £15.81m £17.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £687.01k £665.60k £73.90k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.21k £381.93k £19.85k £66.19k £61.83k
Income - Other trading activities £132.39k £12.98k £198.13k £655.00k £511.71k
Income - Charitable activities £13.33m £13.28m £14.64m £15.76m £15.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £67.61k £59.56k £55.85k £43.36k £45.76k
Income - Other £687.01k £665.60k £73.90k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.87m £14.70m £14.73m £15.53m £17.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £200.22k £137.09k £223.86k £287.15k £213.27k
Expenditure - Governance £39.14k £35.76k £42.43k £39.85k £40.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0