Trustees THE AKILI TRUST
Charity Number: 1114275

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS PAM DIX | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jess Dix | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR Margaret Sills | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Seonaid Blake MacLeod | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL GAVSHON BRADY | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER PITKIN | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE SOFER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK CLAYTON ORCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURA GAVSHON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.