Trustees THE MASTER AND FELLOWS OF THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF SAINT CATHARINE THE VIRGIN IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity Number: 1137463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

63 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir John Benger Chair 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Doriane Zerka Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Nisha Nixon Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Pablo Adolfo Olmos Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Professor Adrian Liston Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Catherine Twilley Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Dr Varun Warrier Trustee 24 February 2023
None on record
Professor Colm Durkan Trustee 11 November 2022
None on record
Dr Peter Candy Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Mikhail Safronov Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Noriko Amano-Patino Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Hend Hanafy Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Liana Cheng Lian Chua Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Tristan Cummings Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Andrzej Szewczak-Harris Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Joe Ellis Trustee 01 September 2020
HUGHES HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Professor Rahul Roychoudhuri Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Dr Holly Canuto Trustee 03 March 2020
None on record
Prof Pierre Raphael Trustee 04 October 2019
None on record
Nicola Robert Trustee 24 May 2019
None on record