THE CRANLEIGH BANDROOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation for people who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, poverty or social and economic circumstances, in particular for the benefit of young musicians and groups, in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA KOSCIA | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Wheatley | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katie Mason | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORMAN EVERY | Trustee | 07 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL HAWTHORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Keith Patrick Rowling | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.61k | £1.71k | £8.73k | £9.51k | £11.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £3.84k | £7.32k | £8.80k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG MUSICIANS AND GROUPS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CRANLEIGH, SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wedgewood
Mapledrakes Road
Ewhurst
CRANLEIGH
Surrey
GU6 7QW
- Phone:
- 01483 276744
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window