Trustees HOPTON CASTLE PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity Number: 1116210

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFERY WILLIAM GEORGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ann Elizabeth Buchanan Jackson | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Franklin Jackson | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Lynda Price | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Price | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rollason | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Rollason | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bason | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bates | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Dean | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ROY LAIDLAR | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY MARQUIS | Trustee | 27 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor PETER MICHAEL MARQUIS | Trustee | 27 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE KATHLEEN GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.