Financial history SWANSEA AND GOWER CANCER SELF HELP GROUP

Charity number: 1116350
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £1.63k £839 £251 £122 £1.83k
Total expenditure £2.74k £18.52k £802 £1.58k £1.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A