Trustees WREXHAM U3A
Charity number: 1115693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Val Hughes | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Holland | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Zarina Kagan | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Hughes | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Dutton | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
GWYNETH MARY HUGHES | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lynn Jones | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Alan John Sutton | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
STANLEY VICTOR MOORE | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.