Financial history TALMUD TORAH YETEV LEV LTD

Charity Number: 1115778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £945.65k £962.22k £997.74k £998.13k £1.41m
Total expenditure £947.73k £919.65k £971.58k £972.71k £1.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £301.15k £733.73k £638.24k £710.46k £964.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £794.61k £962.22k £359.50k £998.11k £1.41m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £151.04k £0 £638.24k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £2 £0 £65
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £24 £2.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £935.41k £918.22k £961.36k £969.04k £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.32k £1.43k £3.31k £1.22k £19.93k
Expenditure - Governance £3.80k £5.00k £0 £0 £6.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £6.92k £2.45k £0