Financial history FOOD FOR THE BRAIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £25.21k £27.86k £49.52k £132.64k £298.03k
Total expenditure £89.98k £66.40k £82.85k £104.83k £307.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.66k N/A N/A N/A N/A