GRASSINGTON FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects and activities of the charity are to advance the education of the public in the arts, in particular the arts of music, speech, drama and dance in all their branches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 September 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN KINGSLEY JAMESON | Chair | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Lockett | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Benjamin Mawbey-Shaw | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Williams | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KITTY NORTH | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.00k | £6.61k | £6.28k | £57.14k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.94k | £10.04k | £6.69k | £57.52k | £967 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 September 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 September 2023 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 July 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 July 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH, DRAMA AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grassington Hub
Garrs Lane
Grassington
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 5AT
- Phone:
- 01756720420
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window