GLYN VALLEY TRAMWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation, education, training and research associated with the former Glyn Valley Tramway and the communities it served. Restoration of the Tramway as a working heritage attraction which will provide training opportunities and educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wrexham
Governance
- 31 October 2007: Standard registration
- GLYN VALLEY TRAMWAY GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Edlington | Chair | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROSS CHRISTIE | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clough | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Raymond Pearson | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Holiday | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MARGARET APPLETON | Trustee | 26 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Terry Evans | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN PIERCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM APPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £634 | £1.79k | £6.30k | £5.52k | £22.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £3.38k | £4.62k | £4.98k | £23.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 July 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 June 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO ACQUIRE, PRESERVE AND RESTORE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ITEMS OF HISTORICAL,EDUCATIONAL, SOCIOLOGICAL, CULTURAL, ARCHITECTURAL, ENGINEERING OR SCIENTIFIC VALUE IN CONNECTION WITH THE RAILWAYS; AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BUT IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE HISTORY, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, CREATION AND EXHIBITION OF RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, CARRIAGES, ROLLING STOCK, EQUIPMENT, ARTEFACTS, DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS, TOGETHER, WITH ANY APPROPRIATE LAND, BUILDINGS AND STRUCTURES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF THE FORMER GLYN VALLEY TRAMWAY IN CHIRK AND THE CEIRIOG VALLEY {'THE TRAMWAY') AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING FACILITIES TO THOSE ENGAGED IN THE HISTORICAL, SOCIOLOGICAL OR TECHNOLOGICAL STUDY, RESTORATION AND OPERATION OF THE TRAMWAY OR RAILWAYS GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR CHIRK AND THE CEIRIOG VELLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Bramblewood Close
Chirk Bank
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL14 5LP
- Phone:
- 0169177471377
- Email:
- thegvttrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window