WEST CAMBRIDGE CHRISTIAN YOUTH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities, Children and Young People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 01 November 2006: Standard registration
- WCCYM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Taylor | Chair | 17 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Kathryn Hilary Gaze | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev William Jonathan Miller | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev KEITH TARRING | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.43k | £38.38k | £45.59k | £55.76k | £74.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.34k | £34.64k | £41.06k | £55.82k | £58.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 July 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 July 2020 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 MAIN STREET
HARDWICK
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7QU
- Phone:
- 01954211900
- Email:
- info@wccym.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window