Financial history NORTH LONDON SINFONIA

Charity Number: 1116684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.47k £5.24k £16.36k £12.37k £15.07k
Total expenditure £10.40k £4.97k £16.28k £17.25k £14.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A