THE GREY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of pupils at Grey High School and Grey Junior School, Port Elizabeth, South Africa by - 1. Providing scholarships, bursaries and prizes 2. Providing and assisting in the provision of teaching facilities, teaching equipment and books 3. Providing and assisting in the provision of schoolmasters 4. Providing and assisting in the maintenance and management of the schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 18 December 2006: Standard registration
- OG EUROPE TRUST (Working name)
- THE OLD GREY EUROPE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES PAUL BUDGE | Chair | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grant Andrew Luther Strydom | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Vaughan Morton | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Satchel | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH OLIVER BUTLER-WHEELHOUSE | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK BRUCE MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WISEMAN | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patrick John Fleming | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|||||
Leslie Frank Bergman | Trustee | 31 October 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.65k | £35.52k | £31.14k | £21.13k | £214.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.11k | £32.17k | £45.65k | £42.09k | £214.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/02/2012 as amended on 31 Mar 2015 as amended on 15 Mar 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL, PORT ELIZABETH, SOUTH AFRICA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING: TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES OR PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO PUPILS AT GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL OR PERSONS INTENDING TO BECOME PUPILS AT GREY HIGH SCHOOL OR GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL; BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL, PORT ELIZABETH, SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARMEL
MANOR WAY
OXSHOTT
LEATHERHEAD
KT22 0HU
- Phone:
- 01372844673
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window