Financial history LONSDALE SWIMMING & SPORTS TRUST LTD

Charity Number: 1120352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £10.62k £36 £72 £0
Total expenditure £10.60k £9.21k £8.70k £85.79k £18.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A