VERITE SPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting a Christian presence in the world of sport, encouraging sportspeople to believe in Jesus Christ and applying the teaching of the Bible to sport. Providing resources and equipment to enable people in the UK and overseas to participate in sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Argentina
- Pakistan
- Togo
- Ukraine
Governance
- 30 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Richard Wingfield Digby | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Howard Keith White | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN MARY COOKE | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Alistair Booth | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.64k | £18.19k | £20.76k | £41.04k | £38.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.93k | £19.86k | £21.59k | £48.05k | £40.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- I) PROMOTING A CHRISTIAN PRESENCE IN THE WORLD OF SPORT II) ENCOURAGING SPORTS PEOPLE TO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST III) APPLYING THE TEACHING OF THE BIBLE TO SPORT IV) PRODUCING RESOURCES TO ENABLE CHRISTIANS TO SHARE THE GOSPEL IN THE WORLD OF SPORT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 THE GLEBE
CUMNOR
OXFORD
OX2 9QA
- Phone:
- 01865864265
- Email:
- stuart@veritesport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window