THE ATLANTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trustees Do Not accept any unsolicited applications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.07k | £220.49k | £59.35k | £589 | £3.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.98k | £224.53k | £59.35k | £40.01k | £84.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 0117 313 8200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window