Financial history THE ARIEH HANDLER SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1117529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £7.27k £40.16k £15.22k £19.32k £8.53k
Total expenditure £30.94k £13.98k £42.93k £36.70k £41.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A