THE MSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the advancement of education of the general public in the United Kingdom by providing information and improving education about debt, money and consumer issues. The Charity gives grants to UK not for profit organisations that deliver activities which make a lasting impact on how people think, behave and manage their money.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katija Malathi Dew | Chair | 31 December 2012 |
|
|||||
Arieh Alexander Gilbert | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Marcus Giles Herbert | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clarissa Coleman | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA BISSESSUR | Trustee | 16 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Davies | Trustee | 16 November 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.64k | £122.23k | £121.45k | £133.12k | £133.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.03k | £84.58k | £197.33k | £131.47k | £132.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND IMPROVING EDUCATION ABOUT DEBT, MONEY AND CONSUMER ISSUES. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS BY ASSISTING IN THE FUNDING OF OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES IN THE UK. 3) TO ASSIST IN THE FUNDING OF SELECTED REGISTERED CHARITIES IN THE UK. 4) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT AND IS CONSIDERED CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Mony Group
1 Dean Street
London
W1D 3RB
- Phone:
- 07565 530730
- Email:
- info@msecharity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window