Financial history MAUREEN BATEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.66k £13.62k £20.05k £17.68k £18.80k
Total expenditure £33.67k £26.44k £32.05k £29.95k £35.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A