Financial history LITTLE WONDERS NURSERY

Charity number: 1120856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £155.85k £87.87k £120.71k £134.32k £190.83k
Total expenditure £72.15k £80.31k £82.41k £95.20k £108.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A