Financial history SOMERVILLE YOUTH & PLAY PROVISION

Charity number: 1121081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £375.31k £467.10k £354.67k £182.80k £250.77k
Total expenditure £360.03k £412.90k £402.55k £409.33k £300.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £83.80k N/A £45.02k
Income from government grants £76.65k £142.23k N/A £38.89k £26.67k