CHURCHES TOGETHER IN DEVON

Charity number: 1126079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ecumenical work in the county of Devon.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,831
Total expenditure: £17,818

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Plymouth City
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Carl Smethurst Chair 20 September 2018
SOUTH WEST BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BRISTOL BAPTIST FUND
Received: On time
RISING HOPE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev David Michael Downing Trustee 09 October 2024
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (SOUTH WESTERN SYNOD) INCORPORATED
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Michael Robert Harrison Trustee 09 October 2024
BISHOP OF EXETER'S CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
ST LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST
Received: On time
Major Paul Billard Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Major Robert Elliott Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Dr Daniel Richard Haylett Trustee 29 September 2022
PLYMOUTH METHODIST MISSION CIRCUIT
Received: On time
PLYMOUTH METHODIST CENTRAL HALL
Received: On time
Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly Methodist District
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CORNWALL
Received: On time
The Venerable Verena Breed Trustee 24 November 2021
THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Ben Richard Haslam Trustee 27 January 2021
CREDITON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Hannah Richards Trustee 30 April 2020
DEVON CHRISTIAN YOUTH CAMPS TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Richard Gillies Gray Trustee 30 January 2019
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (SOUTH WESTERN SYNOD) INCORPORATED
Received: On time
BRUCE GOVETT Trustee 09 September 2013
None on record
MARY ANN JAMES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.66k £14.03k £27.23k £7.79k £18.83k
Total expenditure £15.74k £15.00k £15.10k £16.62k £17.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Townlands
Willand
CULLOMPTON
EX15 2RR
Phone:
01884839218