CROSS-LINKS DOVER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an ecumenical fresh expression of church working in Dover, Kent with a particular focus on the Buckland estate. We provide a wide range of community based activities and services as part of a common effort alongside other agencies, groups and organisations to transform community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 18 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Hawthorne | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Callister | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Humphreys | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Jeff | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mark Camp | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Beverton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.08k | £18.32k | £23.67k | £17.03k | £22.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.56k | £20.45k | £19.86k | £25.21k | £20.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £200 | £10.74k | £1.80k | £5.91k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DOVER DISTRICT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE BUCKLAND ESTATE: A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED TO SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN APPROPRIATE TRANSFERABLE SKILLS TO INCREASE A PERSON'S CHANCES OF GAINING EMPLOYMENT; AND C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF OF THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH, THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, THE METHODIST CHURCH AND ANY OTHER CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN COMMUNION WITH THEM.
Area of benefit
THE DOVER DISTRICT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE BUCKLAND ESTATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cross-Links
9 Sheridan Road
Dover
CT16 2BZ
- Phone:
- 07765 027156
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window