MOTEC-LIFE-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sending Medical equipment & Medical volunteers to Ghana to train & educate & work alongside in the target hospitals. Encourage exchange programmes between target hospitals in Ghana and link hospital(s) in UK where necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
- Ghana
Governance
- 27 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL OFORI-ATTA FRCS | Chair |
|
||||||
ELAINE BIGHAM V P | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LOUISA DRAPER | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAY BOWERS SEC | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR RAYMOND OFORI , TREASURER | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BIGHAM WELFARE | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAYMOND OFORI TREASURER | Trustee | 10 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
GLADYS OFORI-ATTA M SEC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.80k | £7.10k | £6.98k | £6.80k | £800 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.80k | £3.30k | £3.80k | £5.30k | £8.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3. (1) THE OBJECTS. (1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES TO ST JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, KOFORIDUA, AND OR OTHER HOSPITALS IN GHANA FORMALLY LINKED WITH MOTEC. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF STAFF AT ST JOSEPH'S AND OTHER HOSPITALS IN GHANA OFFICIALLY LINKED WITH MOTEC AND OF MEDICAL STAFF AT NHS HOSPITAL INSTITUTIONS IN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
KOFORIDUA, GHANA, AND IN ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 HUNTING GATE
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP2 6NX
- Phone:
- 01442219528
- Email:
- poahgate@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window