ST ALBANS MASORTI SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training in religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 April 2007: Standard registration
- 15 February 2024: Funds received from 1123557 ST ALBANS MASORTI JEWISH YOUTH CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverly Naomi Cohen | Chair | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Freedman | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lionel Taylor | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Shapiro | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Moira Greta Hart | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Schlosberg | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Samuels | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Michelle Perlmutter | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Darren Roukin | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.83k | £299.41k | £352.41k | £318.31k | £340.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.64k | £296.48k | £336.76k | £357.33k | £327.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 28 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT MAINTENANCE AND PROMOTION OF THE ST ALBANS MASORTI SYNAGOGUE ("THE SYNAGOGUE") AND THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE PRACTICE AND TEACHING OF MASORTI (TRADITIONAL) JUDAISM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THIS MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
ST ALBANS HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harben House
13A Harben Parade
Finchley Road
LONDON
NW3 6LH
- Phone:
- 01727860642
- Email:
- info@e-sams.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window