EARL OF CHESTER'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to causes within the county of Cheshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 30 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RODERICK EWAN HARRIES | Chair |
|
||||||
David Charles Starbuck-Edwards | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Graham Huntriss | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kevin Sykes | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID OWEN PICKERING DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RODNEY BRIAN WITTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
nicolaus stuart Jenkins | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.44k | £204.33k | £266.59k | £352.42k | £312.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.52k | £55.21k | £92.70k | £89.25k | £113.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 192 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (OTHER THAN THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION) WITHIN THE COUNTY OF CHESHIRE (AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 1ST OF JANUARY 1974) OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY (AS SO CONSTITUTED) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SJC Chartered Accountants
St. Johns Chambers
Love Street
CHESTER
CH1 1QY
- Phone:
- 01244320532
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window