Accounts and annual returns SYDENHAM MUSIC

Charity Number: 1119584
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required