Home-Start Birmingham North and Inner City

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer support for families with pre-school children living in the Erdington/Stockland Green area of Birmingham. Families are referred to Home-Start by Health Visitors, Midwives, Social Workers,etc., with the families consent. Volunteers visit families in the families own home for a few hours per week. All volunteers attend a preparation course and have an enhanced criminal record bureau check.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 February 2008: Standard registration
- HOME-START STOCKLAND GREEN/ERDINGTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Jane Daly | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Grant | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DILIP PUJARA | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY WILTSHIRE | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Charlene Carter-James | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EAST | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA LILIAN RICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.41k | £298.60k | £188.37k | £254.29k | £303.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.85k | £248.67k | £230.22k | £230.78k | £240.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £104.36k | £103.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £103.41k | N/A | N/A | £103.41k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2007 as amended on 22 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1 TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 2 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 4 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE; WITHIN THE AREA OF STOCKLAND GREEN AND ERDINSTON AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
STOCKLAND GREEN AND ERDINSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Enterprise House
656 Chester Road
Erdington
Birmingham
B23 5TE
- Phone:
- 01213731376
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window