Financial history ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL WORCESTER

Charity Number: 1120644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.43m £16.97m £19.86m £22.35m £24.87m
Total expenditure £15.21m £16.45m £19.28m £21.82m £24.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £22.00k £31.00k £6.70k £78.53k £429.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £198.00k
Income - Charitable activities £15.08m £493.00k £82.32k £81.75k £24.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.00k £0 £10.13k £91.65k £156.00k
Income - Other £335.00k £0 £19.76m £22.10m £0
Income - Legacies £22.00k £0 £3.00k £11.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.11m £16.36m £19.17m £21.62m £24.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £105.00k £81.00k £108.07k £207.41k £181.00k
Expenditure - Governance £21.00k £0 £20.91k £24.07k £26.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0