Financial history BECKERY ISLAND REGENERATION TRUST

Charity number: 1120490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.78k £9.50k £12.33k £376.17k £862.92k
Total expenditure £3.57k £5.10k £8.23k £54.78k £35.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £376.17k £855.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.24k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £855.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.68k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £35.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0