LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1120102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The establishment, conduct and development of a Roman Catholic institution for the advancement of education for the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LEEDS TRINITY & ALL SAINTS (Previous name)
  • LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY COLLEGE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maddeleine Goodhand Trustee 01 July 2024
LEEDS TRINITY STUDENTS UNION
Received: On time
Stuart McLeod Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
David Oldroyd Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Susan Hogston Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Msgr Paul Grogan Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Kevin Patrick O'Connor Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Vijay Joseph Sharma Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Lawrence Angelo Bentley Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Professor Denis Kobzev Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Tara Jane Smith Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Ceri Nursaw Trustee 01 August 2022
HOLOCAUST SURVIVORS' FRIENDSHIP ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Roland Dumisani Maposa Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Sophia Absha Milnes Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
William McCarthy Trustee 01 August 2021
LEEDS MENCAP
Received: On time
Professor Charles Odita Egbu Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Amy Elizabeth Wilson Trustee 17 August 2020
None on record
Thelma Celestia FForde-Escobar Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Emily Christine Patricia Reed Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
JAMIE HANLEY Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Martin Anthony Joseph Holden Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Right Reverend Marcus Stock Trustee 21 November 2014
CATHOLIC CARE (DIOCESE OF LEEDS)
Received: On time
CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE
Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £32.94m £36.41m £45.65m £54.56m £64.23m
Total expenditure £33.19m £33.66m £41.12m £47.98m £59.79m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £500 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.78m £1.24m £1.26m £1.10m £1.46m
Income - Charitable activities £31.07m £35.00m £44.31m £53.37m £61.24m
Income - Endowments £500 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.48k £157.78k £87.45k £84.76k £1.53m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £32.38m £33.66m £40.55m £47.22m £58.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £812.75k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £140.39k £134.07k £170.66k £146.01k £75.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £571.84k £762.71k £951.13k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £40.64m £39.62m £38.97m £39.44m £44.48m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £18.16m £21.81m £31.46m £44.13m £43.37m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£18.20m -£35.56m -£30.02m -£6.64m £0
Total liabilities £19.61m £17.50m £18.70m £21.41m £19.90m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Leeds Trinity University
Brownberrie Lane
Horsforth
LEEDS
LS18 5HD
Phone:
01134673940