Financial history CONGREGATION YETEV LEV DSATMAR ANTWERP LIMITED

Charity Number: 1120657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £745.29k £477.33k £675.97k £739.88k £846.75k
Total expenditure £899.48k £994.79k £545.61k £573.73k £693.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £620.51k N/A £0 £735.53k £846.75k
Income - Other trading activities £124.77k N/A £5.39k £4.35k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £670.58k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £429.45k N/A £545.61k £573.73k £693.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £470.03k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £179.59k N/A £323.54k £318.28k £280.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £249.86k N/A £0 £255.45k £164.13k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0